U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20044
  • Case Name: Elizabeth Ann Schwartz
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Filing Fee Payment Ch 13]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Transfer of Claim - FEE]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Schedules]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Clerk Notice of Claim Filed Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 501(c)]
January, 2025
  • January 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [AAutoAsignJudge13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.