U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20048
  • Case Name: Kristin Kay Hanna
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Final Decree]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Discharging Debtor(s)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
January, 2025
  • January 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.