U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20054
  • Case Name: Erik Michael Peterson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Withdrawal of Claim]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee's Interim Report]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Financial Management Course]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
January, 2025
  • January 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Statement About Your Social Security Number(s) (Form 121)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.