U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02599
  • Case Name: Varsity Driveaway, LLC v. Trusted Truck Transport, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 29, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • April 29, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Return of Service of Subpoena]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [ESI Protocol]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2025
  • January 23, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.