U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40842
  • Case Name: Kristie Michelle Schimmel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Change of Address]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Verified Mailing Matrix]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Schedules]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
January, 2025
  • January 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Fix Claim Owner]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.