U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10051
  • Case Name: Hasaan Ibn Wali Ahmed
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Receipt of Installment Payment (Not Final)]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Financial Management Course]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Order Requiring Payment of Filing Fee or Case May Be Dismissed]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Flags Set-Reset]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Final Financial Management Notice]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
January, 2025
  • January 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [DeBN Request Form]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.