U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20068
  • Case Name: Renee Francine Walker
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Discharging Debtor(s)]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Agreement]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
January, 2025
  • January 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [AAutoAsignJudge7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.