U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10049
  • Case Name: Connie Rae Morris
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • May 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • May 20, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Affidavit]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Fix Claim Owner]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Dismiss Case]
January, 2025
  • January 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.