U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02551
  • Case Name: Broeckelmann v. BTRS Holdings, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Joint Mediation Notice]
  • April 30, 2025: [Amend Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 19, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 12, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Protective Order]
January, 2025
  • January 28, 2025: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.