U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40037
  • Case Name: Krista Aldeen Sims
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Discharging Debtor(s)]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Agreement]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Agreement]
January, 2025
  • January 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [AAutoAsignJudge7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.