U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20108
  • Case Name: Thomas Paul Freemyer and Janet Lynn Freemyer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Schedules]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
January, 2025
  • January 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [AAutoAsignJudge13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.