U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20078
  • Case Name: Tamara Lynn Thierry
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Employ]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Discharging Debtor(s)]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Objection Deadline]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Employ]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Employ]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Withdraw Document]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Objection Deadline]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Employ]
February, 2025
  • February 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.