U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10098
  • Case Name: Joshua Michael Obermeyer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Final Decree]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Discharging Debtor(s)]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Approving Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
February, 2025
  • February 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.