U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10099
  • Case Name: Toby L Myers and Jamie M Myers
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Continue Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Financial Management Course]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Final Financial Management Notice]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Continue Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Objection]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Objection Deadline]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Relief from Stay]
February, 2025
  • February 20, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Schedule A/B]
  • February 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [AAutoAsignJudge7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.