U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11314
  • Case Name: Nicholas Adam Ford and Geneva Ellen Ford
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Transfer of Claim - FEE]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order Setting Deadline for Submission of Order]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
February, 2025
  • February 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Financial Management Course]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.