U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20134
  • Case Name: Kirk Wayne Palmer and Erin Elizabeth Palmer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • May 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • May 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Complaint]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Relief from Stay]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Response]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Employ]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Objection Deadline]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Relief from Stay]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Objection Deadline]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Notice of Preferred Creditor Address]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Objection Deadline]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Employ]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Late Assets)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Employ]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Avoid Lien]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
February, 2025
  • February 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [AAutoAsignJudge7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.