U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-03036
  • Case Name: Crump v. Unified Government of Johnson County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Clarify]
  • March 31, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Leave]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 21, 2025: [Witness List]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Conventionally Filed Exhibits]
  • March 18, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • March 17, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2025: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 13, 2025: [Affidavit]
February, 2025
  • February 13, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.