U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10045
  • Case Name: Michael E Day
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Final Decree]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Discharging Debtor(s)]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee's Interim Report]
February, 2025
  • February 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Financial Management Course]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.