U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40073
  • Case Name: Kayly Amber Wilson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Financial Management Course]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Reaffirmation Agreement]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
February, 2025
  • February 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • February 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.