U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-05018
  • Case Name: Cairo of Western Kansas, LLC v. Samy
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Status Report]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 10, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • April 08, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • April 07, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 25, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • March 21, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 19, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Notice Approving Request for Entry of Clerk's Extension of Time]
  • March 19, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Request for Entry of Clerk's Extension of Time Pursuant to LBR 5075.1(a)]
February, 2025
  • February 19, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.