U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10119
  • Case Name: Linda F Rhone
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Compensation]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Schedules]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Dismiss Case]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Complaint]
February, 2025
  • February 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.