U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11296
  • Case Name: Zachary Ryan Petersen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Withdraw Document]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Objection]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Late Assets)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee's Interim Report]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [2004 Exam]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Objection]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Delay Discharge]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Change of Address]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Objection Deadline]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
February, 2025
  • February 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Financial Management Course]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.