U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10126
  • Case Name: Shelbert Jermaine Williams and Tanola Rosetta Williams
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Financial Management Course]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Debtor's Declaration Concerning Schedules]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Amended Schedules]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Notice of Preferred Creditor Address]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Receipt of Installment Payment (Not Final)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Hearing Held (Motion)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Request for Notice]
February, 2025
  • February 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Withdraw Document]
  • February 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [AAutoAsignJudge7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.