U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40096
  • Case Name: Albert Lee Sipple, Sr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Dismiss Case]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
February, 2025
  • February 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [AAutoAsignJudge13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.