U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40091
  • Case Name: Kandice Marsha Paulina Burch
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Resolving]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Claim]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Withdraw Document]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Entry (Auto Confirm)]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Relief from Stay]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Extend Automatic Stay]
February, 2025
  • February 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Financial Management Course]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.