U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-21644
  • Case Name: Kyleene Alexandra Folkerts
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Order]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Filing Fee Payment Ch 13]
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Release Wages]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Change of Address]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Change of Address]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.