U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10066
  • Case Name: Aaron Lee Young and Geneva Nicole Young
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Objection Deadline]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Withdraw As Attorney]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Agreement]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Receipt of Installment Payment (Not Final)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Change of Address]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Amended Schedule C (Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.