U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40298
  • Case Name: Brett Michael Hartley
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Response]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice To Allow Claims]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Administrative Expenses]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Held (Motion)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Change of Address]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Relief from Stay]
  • March 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Administrative Expenses]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.