U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cr-10016-5
  • Case Name: USA v. Robinson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Expert Testimony]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Expert Testimony]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Expert Testimony]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Bond Report]
  • March 28, 2025: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 28, 2025: [Bond]
  • March 28, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Bond Report]
  • March 25, 2025: [Bond]
  • March 25, 2025: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention (Oral)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 25, 2025: [Terminating Attorney]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Designate as Complex Case]
  • March 19, 2025: [Entry of Appearance by USA]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Designate as Complex Case]
  • March 17, 2025: [Pretrial and Criminal Case Management Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • March 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 17, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 17, 2025: [Detention (Oral)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order re: Due Process Protections Act]
  • March 14, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Bond Report]
  • March 14, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 11, 2025: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • March 11, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 11, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Bond Report]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention (Oral)]
  • March 10, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 10, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 10, 2025: [Detention (Oral)]
  • March 10, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 10, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 07, 2025: [Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.