U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40066
  • Case Name: Yunchang Kwak
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Filing Fee Payment Ch 13]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Resolving]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Schedules]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.