U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02604
  • Case Name: Scannell Properties #516, LLC et al v. City of Edwardsville et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery Hearing]
  • May 07, 2025: [Discovery Hearing]
  • May 06, 2025: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • May 02, 2025: [Supplement]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 29, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 11, 2025: [Amended Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 26, 2025: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 26, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 25, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 24, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 24, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • March 24, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Setting Status Conference]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.