U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02184
  • Case Name: Dairy Farmers of America, Inc. et al v. Fike Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 07, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Exclude Expert Testimony]
  • May 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 01, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 26, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 24, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 19, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.