U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40042
  • Case Name: Carroll Wayne Munyan and Indiaa La-Trice Bailey-Munyan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing]
  • May 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Dismiss Case]
  • May 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Filing Fee Payment Ch 13]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.