U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-40340
  • Case Name: Gerald Duane Terrill and Amy Jo Terrill
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Compensation]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Modify Plan Payments]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Employer)]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Compensation]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Modify Plan Payment]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Release Wages]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.