U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10192
  • Case Name: Jennifer Marie Fay
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Trustee's Initial Report]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Financial Management Course]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Employee Income Records]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.