U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-10499
  • Case Name: Camisha D Conley
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Modify Plan Payments]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Held (Motion)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Debtor)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Release Wages]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Release Wages]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Schedules]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.