U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-40210
  • Case Name: Alyce Katharyn Remington
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Trustee's Interim Report]
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Dismiss Case]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Held (Motion)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
March, 2025
  • March 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Compensation]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.