U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11267
  • Case Name: David Kent Teitrick, Jr
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Final Decree]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Flags Set-Reset]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Financial Management Course]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Flags Set-Reset]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Final Financial Management Notice]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.