U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10167
  • Case Name: Chad Anthony Griffith
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • May 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Response]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Claim]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Schedules]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Corrective Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.