U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10026
  • Case Name: Brittany Pat Pinckney
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Withdrawal of Claim]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Clerk Notice of Claim Filed Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 501(c)]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Debtor's Declaration Concerning Schedules]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Transfer of Claim - FEE]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.