U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40767
  • Case Name: Nicholas Robert Strasburg
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Final Decree]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Trustee's Interim Report]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Administrative Expenses]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Turnover]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Objection Deadline]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Administrative Expenses]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Turnover]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Employ]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.