U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40330
  • Case Name: Brian Lee Shinaberger
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Account (UST Filed)]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Distribution]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Update Other Deadlines]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Objection Deadline]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Report (UST Filed)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Notice of Closing Information]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Request for Closing Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.