U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10189
  • Case Name: Gerarda Inez Vargas
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Notice of Amended Schedule C]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Amended Schedule C (Only)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Amended Schedules]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Receipt of Installment Payment (Not Final)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Financial Management Course]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Financial Management Course]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • March 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Employee Income Records]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income 122A-1 (Formerly Chapter 7 Means Test)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Debtor's Declaration Concerning Schedules]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Schedule J]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Schedule I]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Schedule H]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Schedule G]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Schedule E/F]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Schedule D]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Correct Voluntary Petition]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Verified Mailing Matrix]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Statement About Your Social Security Number(s) (Form 121)]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [AAutoAsignJudge7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.