U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10186
  • Case Name: James Jared Gillett
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Objection Deadline]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Hearing Held (Motion)]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Objection Deadline]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Abandon]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Relief from Stay]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Financial Management Course]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Receipt of Installment Payment (Not Final)]
March, 2025
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Notice of Amended Schedule C]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Statement of Intent]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Amended Schedule C (Only)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Employee Income Records]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.