U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40072
  • Case Name: Kyle Charles Wahl and Elena Rose Wahl
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Denying Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Hearing Held (Motion)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Late Assets)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Change of Address]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Change of Address]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.