U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-21394
  • Case Name: Mieko N Giblin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Final Decree]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Flags Set-Reset]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Late Assets)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.