U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20142
  • Case Name: Tralen Luvell Davis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Financial Management Course]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Compensation]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Courtroom Minute Entry (Auto Confirm)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Clerk Notice of Claim Filed Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 501(c)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Schedules]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Filing Fee Payment Ch 13]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Schedules]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.