U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10172
  • Case Name: Gloria Marie Conde
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Change of Address]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Financial Management Course]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Order on Application to Have Filing Fee Waived]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.