U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-10351
  • Case Name: Bradley Jason Sherbert and Jennifer Michelle Sherbert
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Trustee's Interim Report]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Post-Confirmation Amendment of Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.