U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20273
  • Case Name: Melissa Diane Brownell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Agreement]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Statement of Declination]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Statement of Presumed Abuse]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Debtor's Rebuttal of Presumption of Abuse]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Employee Income Records]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.